This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2022 at 05:09:44 (UTC).

YESCAS, JANET ANN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 YESCAS, JANET ANN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PRIVER, MARK S., MAY, GUS T. and JOHNSON, BARBARA R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2943

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PRIVER, MARK S.

MAY, GUS T.

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHLER PAUL

Decedent

YESCAS JANET ANN

Others

LUKAN MARK

ST. THOMAS AQUINAS SEMINARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EVERETT NICHOLAS G.

Other Attorneys

ALVAREZ JUSTIN MICHAEL

BURROWS JASON MCEWING

 

Court Documents

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

3/22/2022: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

11/9/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

11/12/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/12/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/12/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/12/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/12/2021: Minute Order

Joinder

9/15/2021: Joinder

Objection - Trust Petition - OBJECTION TO WILL CONTEST AND PETITION FOR ORDER IMPOSING LIABILITY FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

9/15/2021: Objection - Trust Petition - OBJECTION TO WILL CONTEST AND PETITION FOR ORDER IMPOSING LIABILITY FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Will Deposited - Holo 1 pg - Dated - 04/08/2018

9/7/2021: Will Deposited - Holo 1 pg - Dated - 04/08/2018

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

9/7/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

8/3/2021: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/18/2021: Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service - Proof of Service by First-Class Mail

7/29/2021: Proof of Service - Proof of Service by First-Class Mail

Notice - Hearing

7/23/2021: Notice - Hearing

Contest of Will - WILL CONTEST AND PETITION FOR ORDER IMPOSING LIABILITY FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

7/23/2021: Contest of Will - WILL CONTEST AND PETITION FOR ORDER IMPOSING LIABILITY FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Objection - PAUL MICHLERS OBJECTION TO MARK LUKANS PETITION (filed a will contest)

7/23/2021: Objection - PAUL MICHLERS OBJECTION TO MARK LUKANS PETITION (filed a will contest)

Summons - issued

7/23/2021: Summons - issued

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Contest of Will Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Probate Code 850 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketSupplement (Second Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases (18STPB09920 - Conservatorship ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSupplement (First Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURROWS JASON MCEWING

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ JUSTIN MICHAEL