This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2022 at 17:57:26 (UTC).

YERVAND KNADZHYAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 YERVAND KNADZHYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1934

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNADZHYAN YERVAND

Defendant

JAGUAR LAND ROVER OF NORTH AMERICA LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

PEHLEVANIAN ZAVEN ARMEN

WOLF MATTHEW CLARKE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/21/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2025
  • Hearing01/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jaguar Land Rover of North America, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yervand Knadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yervand Knadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yervand Knadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yervand Knadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEHLEVANIAN ZAVEN ARMEN