This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 10:47:09 (UTC).

YELENA LENGLE VS DAVID HAZAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 YELENA LENGLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID HAZAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9488

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LENGLE YELENA

Defendants and Respondents

HAZAN DAVID

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 20

CALIFORNIA STATE OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

ELZAN MICHAEL DOE 1

EXPRESS HOME BUILDERS AND DESIGN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RAMSEY EDWARD ESQ.

PADUA KARINA A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

KWAK JOHN JIWOONG

FEUER MICHAEL NELSON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Ex Parte Application

3/14/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/14/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

7/6/2018: Unknown

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/28/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/28/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/19/2017: NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/17/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

4/27/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE;ETC

4/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE;ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

10/3/2017: ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by David Hazan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND MOTION CUT-OFF DATES) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND MOTI...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial, FSC, and Related Discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates); Filed by David Hazan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC659488    Hearing Date: February 19, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED; MOTIONS TO COMPEL

On April 27, 2017, Plaintiff Yelena Lengle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against David Hazan, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, and the State of California for negligence, dangerous condition of public property, and negligence relating to an automobile accident. On August 28, 2018, defendant Michael Elzan (“Defendant”) was named as Doe 1 and served with the summons and complaint on February 25, 2019. On July 8, 2019, Plaintiff served request for admissions, special interrogatories, form interrogatories, and requests for production on Defendant. Plaintiff states Defendant served unverified responses containing objections to the special interrogatories and no other responses.

Plaintiff moves for an order deeming admitted requests for admissions, further responses to special interrogatories, responses to form interrogatories and requests for production, and monetary sanctions. All four motions will be heard on February 19, 2020.

Defendant argues the discovery requests were not properly served on him because he had not yet retained defense counsel when Plaintiff served defense counsel with the discovery. Plaintiff then served new sets of discovery, and Defendant states he has served verified responses to that discovery. Accordingly, the motions are MOOT.

The Court does not award sanctions because it appears defense counsel had not been retained when Plaintiff served the discovery, and therefore the first set of discovery, which is the subject of these motions, was not properly served.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.