Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2019 at 09:39:44 (UTC).

YASUSHI SHIROMI, ET AL. VS ANDREW BARRA

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 YASUSHI SHIROMI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANDREW BARRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3226

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHIROMI YASUSHI

SHIROMI MIEKO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BARRA ANDREW

RONALD DINNEL AND LINDA DINNEL

DINNEL RONALD

DINNEL LINDA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RONALD DINNEL AND LINDA DINNEL

DINNEL RONALD

DINNEL LINDA

Not Classified By Court

RONALD DINNEL LINDA DINNEL RONALD DINNEL AND LINDA DINNEL AS TRUSTEES OF THE DINNEL RA&LG 1995 TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HOMAMPOUR ARASH

GRGURIC SHERRY L.

SAFARIAN HARRY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT INITIAL PLEADING)

8/1/2019: Notice of Ruling - MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT INITIAL PLEADING)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

7/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

5/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

Proof of Service - No Service

4/30/2019: Proof of Service - No Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RONALD DINNEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

4/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RONALD DINNEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Separate Statement

4/25/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LINDA DINNEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

4/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LINDA DINNEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Motion for Summary Judgment

4/25/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

4/26/2019: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Answer

3/19/2019: Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Reply - Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

1/25/2019: Reply - Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Opposition - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Strike re Complaint

1/18/2019: Opposition - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Strike re Complaint

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/31/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/31/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

11/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Andrew Barra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketReply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ANDREW BARRA'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT); Filed by Andrew Barra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Non Opposition to D's Motion to Strike Portions of the Complain); Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Linda Dinnel (Cross-Complainant); Ronald Dinnel (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff); Ronald Dinnel and Linda Dinnel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketOpposition (to Demurrer re Complaint); Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketOpposition to Motion to Strike re Complaint; Filed by Yasushi Shiromi (Plaintiff); Mieko Shiromi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRGURIC SHERRY L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFARIAN HARRY