This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 01:54:38 (UTC).

YASMINA BEATRIZ MORAN VS VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 YASMINA BEATRIZ MORAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5403

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORAN YASMINA BEATRIZ

Defendant

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRITO EDUARDO ARTURO

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/5/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/5/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/5/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2024
  • Hearing08/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Yasmina Beatriz Moran (Plaintiff); As to: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Yasmina Beatriz Moran (Plaintiff); As to: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Yasmina Beatriz Moran (Plaintiff); As to: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRITO EDUARDO ARTURO