Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 10:47:44 (UTC).

YASMIN M ET AL VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 YASMIN M filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6469

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

HYDE PARK ELEMENTARY SCHOOL

DOES 1 TO 50

Minor

M. YASMIN

Guardian Ad Litem

HERNANDEZ CELIA PALMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HURRELL & CANTRALL LLP

Minor Attorney

ALDER C. MICHAEL ESQ.

Other Attorneys

ALDER C MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

8/22/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS

11/3/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

12/6/2017: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/23/2018: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Unknown

6/25/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/26/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/7/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Request for Judicial Notice

11/30/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

11/30/2018: Declaration

Declaration

11/30/2018: Declaration

Declaration

11/30/2018: Declaration

Other -

11/30/2018: Other -

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/30/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration

2/4/2019: Declaration

Response

2/14/2019: Response

Objection

2/15/2019: Objection

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/19/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District Erroneously Sued as Hyde Park Elementary School Erroneously Sued As Hyde Park Elementary School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity Erroneously Sued As Hyde Park Elementary School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity Erroneously Sued As Hyde Park Elementary School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District Erroneously Sued as Hyde Park Elementary School Erroneously Sued As Hyde Park Elementary School (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity Erroneously Sued As Hyde Park Elementary School (Defenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yasmin M. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yasmin M. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Yasmin M. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE SUPERVISION OF STUDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC666469    Hearing Date: September 28, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

YASMIN M.,

Plaintiff,

v.

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC666469

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Celia Hernandez (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Yasmin M. (“Claimant”). There are numerous problems with this petition:

1. Counsel seeks to deduct $114,000 in attorney’s fees, which is 40% of the total settlement. Petitioner’s Counsel should be prepared to explain why he is entitled to this amount.

2. Counsel seeks to deduct $2,579.50 in costs for unspecified professional fees from Gracious Services, Inc. It is not clear from the record how these costs are related to this litigation.

3. Counsel seeks to deduct $150 for a “Sign Up Fee.” That is not permissible.

4. Counsel seeks to deduct $946.17 for Westlaw research fees. The only description is “Legal Research,” so the Court cannot determine if this research was reasonably related to this case. Also, it is unlikely that Counsel pays for each research session separately, as law firms generally pay for an annual subscription.

5. Petitioner seeks to deduct thousands of dollars in copying costs. Each entry merely states “Copies - Black and White” with a dollar amount. These costs are not totaled separately, so the Court cannot evaluate whether the overall amount is reasonable. There is no explanation of what documents were copied for each of these charges, so the Court cannot ascertain whether the charges are reasonably related to this case. The Court usually gives counsel the benefit of the doubt on nominal copying charges. However, in this case, Petitioner’s counsel seeks to deduct thousands of dollars in copying charges—on top of 40% of the settlement for attorney’s fees—and the Court cannot determine whether these charges are appropriate based upon the petition.

DATED: September 28, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALDER C MICHAEL