This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 01:48:56 (UTC).

YASMEEN YOUNAN VS SENIOR RESOURCE GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 YASMEEN YOUNAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SENIOR RESOURCE GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6795

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNAN YASMEEN

Defendant

SENIOR RESOURCE GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAKOIAN JACK

Defendant Attorney

MCCLINTOCK RACHEL LAUREN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/29/2020

10/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/29/2020

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO BINDING ARBITRATION; PROPOSED ORDER

7/8/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO BINDING ARBITRATION; PROPOSED ORDER

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Compel Arbitration

11/26/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/28/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/28/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/15/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (and Stay Pending Litigation, Filed by Defendant senior Resource Group LLC;) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 2:07 PM in Department 16; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation pursuant to binding arbitration; Proposed Order); Filed by Senior Resource Group LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Senior Resource Group LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yasmeen Younan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yasmeen Younan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yasmeen Younan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yasmeen Younan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENIOR RESOURCE GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAKOIAN JACK