Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2020 at 10:08:20 (UTC).

YARON HASSID VS ROYAL CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 YARON HASSID filed an Other lawsuit against ROYAL CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0732

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASSID YARON

Defendant

ROYAL CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIEBER JEFFREY EDWARD

BIALACK EDWARD MARC

LIEBER JEFFREY E.

BIALACK EDWARD M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

12/20/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

5/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Judgment

5/16/2019: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...) OF 05/16/2019

5/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...) OF 05/16/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

5/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

2/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/22/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION JEFFREY E LIEBER FOR DEFAULT

2/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION JEFFREY E LIEBER FOR DEFAULT

Statement of the Case

2/22/2019: Statement of the Case

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default AND Default Judgment...)

3/1/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default AND Default Judgment...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/14/2019

1/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/14/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

12/31/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

10/11/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNotice (Entry of Judgment); Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yaron Hassid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIALACK EDWARD M. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBER JEFFREY EDWARD