This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:54:39 (UTC).

YANQUING JIN VS ROSEMEAD BEAUTY SCHOOL ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by YANQUING JIN against ROSEMEAD BEAUTY SCHOOL in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9859

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JIN YANQUING

Respondents and Defendants

KG&B INVESTMENT INC

ROSEMEAD BEAUTY SCHOOL

DOES 1 TO 50

 

Court Documents

Notice

11/30/2018: Notice

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/8/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

4/4/2019: Substitution of Attorney

DEFENDANT ROSEMEAD BEAUTY SCHOOL AKA KG&B INVESTMENT, INC.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/27/2018: DEFENDANT ROSEMEAD BEAUTY SCHOOL AKA KG&B INVESTMENT, INC.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/27/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUMMONS

2/13/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

1/16/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Yanquing Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Hauser, John A., Law Offices of (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice (of Lien); Filed by Yanquing Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DEFENDANT ROSEMEAD BEAUTY SCHOOL AKA KG&B INVESTMENT, INC.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Answer; Filed by rosemead Beauty School (Defendant); KG&B Investment Inc (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by rosemead Beauty School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yanquing Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Yanquing Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Yanquing Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC689859    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 2

Jin v. Rosemead Beauty School et al.

The Motion to Continue Trial, filed on 11/19/2019 by Plaintiff, is GRANTED.

The Court continues the trial to the date jointly selected by all parties, May 13, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 2.  The final status conference is set for April 29, 2020 at 10:00 in Department 2.  All motion and discovery deadlines are to be calculated by virtue of the new trial date.  The trial date is firm.  The parties should not expect further continuances.  Parties are ordered to inform their witnesses and experts of the new trial date forthwith. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice.