This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 07:57:15 (UTC).

YANIV ISRAELI, ET AL. VS YORAM FISHAMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 YANIV ISRAELI, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YORAM FISHAMAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6343

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ISRAELI YANIV

ISRAELI IFAT

Defendants

GARCIA RODOLFO SALGADO

USA GENERAL CONSTRUCTION

SHUSHAN AMOS BEN AKA AMI BALULU

FISHAMAN YORAM

FISHMAN PROPERTIES INC.

FISHMAN ROBYN AKA ROBIN FISHMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REICH JACOB

Defendant Attorney

CROCKETT WILLIAM EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES RESPO...)

2/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES RESPO...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/18/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

9/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

9/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

9/25/2019: Case Management Order

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/1/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/23/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

9/23/2019: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/23/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

9/23/2019: Separate Statement

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON A MOTION TO COMPEL

9/24/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON A MOTION TO COMPEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION F...)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION F...)

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

6/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

6/21/2019: Case Management Statement

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • Hearing12/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Hearing12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Hearing11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Hearing02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Respo...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ON A MOTION TO COMPEL) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application f...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jacob Reich (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint (2nd); Filed by Yaniv Israeli (Plaintiff); Ifat Israeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yaniv Israeli (Plaintiff); Ifat Israeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yaniv Israeli (Plaintiff); Ifat Israeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less