This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 11:06:33 (UTC).

YANIRA VEGA MELGAR VS LNS PARTNERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 YANIRA VEGA MELGAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LNS PARTNERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3155

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEGA MELGAR YANIRA AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

LNS PARTNERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HOTEL CHICO LLC DBA HOTEL SOLAIRE A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN CHARLES

GOLDSTEIN CHARLES H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/11/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Complaint

12/2/2019: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

12/8/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2020

12/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILIUOKALANI H. MARTIN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FILING OF ANSWER OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT LNS PARTNERS, INC.

12/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILIUOKALANI H. MARTIN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FILING OF ANSWER OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT LNS PARTNERS, INC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/31/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/28/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

7/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2020

4/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2020

Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Jury Trial ((4 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice; Complaint; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action;); Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Filing of Answer of Entry of Default of Defendant LNS Partners, Inc.) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 4:52 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by HOTEL CHICO, LLC DBA HOTEL SOLAIRE, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HOTEL CHICO, LLC DBA HOTEL SOLAIRE, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yanira Vega Melgar, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LNS PARTNERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN CHARLES