This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 16:12:21 (UTC).

YANG, YANDONG VS ZHANG, FUYUAN

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 YANG, YANDONG filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ZHANG, FUYUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAY, CHARLES Q. and HORAN, JAMES E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1899

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CLAY, CHARLES Q.

HORAN, JAMES E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YANG YANDONG

Respondent

ZHANG FUYUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SEROPIAN EDISSON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/1/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration of ZHANG

11/29/2021: Declaration - Declaration of ZHANG

Response - Civil Harassment (non-violence) - Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

11/29/2021: Response - Civil Harassment (non-violence) - Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

Declaration - Declaration-MC-025

11/29/2021: Declaration - Declaration-MC-025

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - DENIED

11/9/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - DENIED

Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

11/9/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Minute Order

12/22/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/12/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/22/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Declaration - Exhibit A

11/29/2021: Declaration - Exhibit A

Proof of Service

11/19/2021: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 201, Horan, James E., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 201, Horan, James E., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Exhibit A ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration-MC-025 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment (non-violence) (Response - Civil Harassment (violence) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of ZHANG ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seropian, Eddison