This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 22:05:15 (UTC).

YANCY CABRERA VS MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 YANCY CABRERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0049

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA YANCY

Defendant

MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMARIA FIORELLA

Defendant Attorney

AMARO MICHAEL L.

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/5/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/4/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/27/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Hearing11/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YANCY CABRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YANCY CABRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YANCY CABRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YANCY CABRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMARO MICHAEL L. ESQ.