Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2021 at 23:28:01 (UTC).

YAN SHALOMOV VS GRACE CHO

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 YAN SHALOMOV filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GRACE CHO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9151

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHALOMOV YAN

Defendant

CHO GRACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERMANI-NEJAD RAMIN

Defendant Attorney

ASH PAUL V

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

4/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/9/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/26/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Grace Cho (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Grace Cho (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Grace Cho (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yan Shalomov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yan Shalomov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yan Shalomov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yan Shalomov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERMANI-NEJAD RAMIN