Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 12:09:04 (UTC).

ZHAO, YI VS FLORES, JUAN A

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 ZHAO, YI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FLORES, JUAN A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0738

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

YAN ADELE

ZHAO YI

Respondent

FLORES JUAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YAN ADELE LULU

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Default FL170

10/27/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Judgment

10/30/2020: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

11/20/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/6/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons - by substituted service, a declaration of reasonable diligence and declaration of mailing are filed

7/9/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - by substituted service, a declaration of reasonable diligence and declaration of mailing are filed

Declaration - of mailing

7/9/2020: Declaration - of mailing

Declaration - of reasonable diligence

7/9/2020: Declaration - of reasonable diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence

7/13/2020: Declaration of Due Diligence

Proof of Service of Summons

7/13/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Case Assignment - Amended

6/16/2020: Notice - Case Assignment - Amended

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/3/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/3/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

6/3/2020: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

6/12/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/12/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

FL_General Family Law - DSU - Notice - Filing of Uniform Support Petition

6/12/2020: FL_General Family Law - DSU - Notice - Filing of Uniform Support Petition

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Pasadena

6/12/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Pasadena

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Pasadena

6/3/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Pasadena

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Mailed to Respondent on 10/28/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Mailing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of reasonable diligence ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of mailing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (by substituted service, a declaration of reasonable diligence and declaration of mailing are filed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment (Amended )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAN ADELE LULU