This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:06:36 (UTC).

YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, A JAPAN CORPORATION VS ANH TUAN LA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 YAMADATOSHI AND CO , LTD, A JAPAN CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANH TUAN LA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0777

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAMADATOSHI AND CO. LTD A JAPAN CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DAO JULIE

LA ANH TUAN AKA JACK LA

KIM SEONG AKA ANDREW KIM

JD ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

K2 INVESTMENT GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KIM YU SEONG AKA ANDREW KIM

VQ TRADING INC.

VQ GLOBAL USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants and Defendants

LA ANH TUAN AKA JACK LA

K2 INVESTMENT GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KIM YU SEONG AKA ANDREW KIM

DISTRIBUCIONES LOU S.A. A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION OF UNKNOWN FORM

SHEEN ASIA INDUSTRIES LTD A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION OF UNKNOWN FORM

ANTHONY GREG

ARC BUSINESS ANGELS INC. A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION OF UNKNOWN FORM.

COSTON ROLAND

ROBERTS LEA

GEB RATUNNO

MARIA MORATO MATEU JOSE

AEQUIS CAPITAL GROUP HOLDINGS A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION OF UNKNOWN FORM

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BACH JACOB B.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVINE J. ERIC

CHONOLES STEPHEN J.

LEFF ANDREW L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO ...)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS SET AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS SET AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/10/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/10/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

11/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS SET AT HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (K2 INVESTMENT GROUP) AND HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (ANH TUAN LA AKA JACK LA)

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS SET AT HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (K2 INVESTMENT GROUP) AND HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (ANH TUAN LA AKA JACK LA)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

11/12/2021: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

11/12/2021: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Appearance

10/12/2021: Notice of Appearance

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/12/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/12/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/12/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/12/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...)

9/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...)

Notice - NOTICE ORDERS SET AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY THE COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO PROVE-UP TRIAL FOR TODAY'S FAILURE TO

9/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE ORDERS SET AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY THE COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO PROVE-UP TRIAL FOR TODAY'S FAILURE TO

Case Management Statement

9/1/2021: Case Management Statement

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Prove-Up as to Defendant Anh Tuan La

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Orders set at Order to Show Cause Hearings and Case Management Conference); Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why The Answer Should Not Be Stricken As To Defendant K2) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why A Default Prove-Up Should Not Be Set At The Next Court Date As To Anh Tuan La) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Matter Should Not Proceed to Prove-Up Trial as to Defendant Yu Seong Kim) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YAMADATOSHI AND CO., LTD, a Japan corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JD ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE J. ERIC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEFF ANDREW