This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 13:49:13 (UTC).

YAMA INC VS CEDAR RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2017 YAMA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CEDAR RESTAURANT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9324

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAMA INC

Respondents and Defendants

YAMASHIRO

CEDAR RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN GARY STEVEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/21/2017: Minute Order

AMENDED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/14/2017: AMENDED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/7/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COVER SHEET RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/21/2017: COVER SHEET RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVTCE OF SUMMONS

3/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVTCE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

2/15/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

2/15/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

2/7/2017: SUMMONS

UNLIMITED CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DEMAND: $33,943.00 1. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED; ETC

2/7/2017: UNLIMITED CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DEMAND: $33,943.00 1. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by YAMA, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketAMENDED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCOVER SHEET RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVTCE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YAMA, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketUNLIMITED CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DEMAND: $33,943.00 1. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less