This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 09:03:20 (UTC).

YALANDA M THOMAS VS HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 YALANDA M THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1739

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS YALANDA M

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER

HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC.

TENOLD RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MALLORY GEORGE LORENZO

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/6/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/6/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/6/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/6/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/13/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

11/3/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

11/3/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Answer

11/3/2022: Answer

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

11/17/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2025
  • Hearing04/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • Hearing09/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); As to: YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); Service Date: 10/04/2022; Service Cost: 84.65; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAddress for YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 04/13/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff); As to: HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: YALANDA M THOMAS (Plaintiff); As to: HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less