This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:40:36 (UTC).

YAIR BEN MOSHE VS MUNGCHI INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 YAIR BEN MOSHE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MUNGCHI INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2624

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MOSHE YAIR BEN

Defendants and Respondents

MUNGCHI INC

NOH RICKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BIGGINS CHAD

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

2/22/2018: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Yair Ben Moshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Yair Ben Moshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Yair Ben Moshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION - ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT DEBTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 1710.25)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Sister State Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mungchi Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIGGINS CHAD ESQ.