This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 17:09:30 (UTC).

YAIKA FRANKLIN VS LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 YAIKA FRANKLIN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3722

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANKLIN YAIKA

Defendant

LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAURIGUE MICHAEL JOE

Defendant Attorney

WALSH DENNIS J

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/31/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/31/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/10/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • Hearing06/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Case Management Conference); Filed by YAIKA FRANKLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by YAIKA FRANKLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by YAIKA FRANKLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by YAIKA FRANKLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by YAIKA FRANKLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.