This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 06:08:33 (UTC).

YADIRA PAYAN VALDEZ VS PLAZA WEST COVINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 YADIRA PAYAN VALDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PLAZA WEST COVINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4443

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALDEZ YADIRA PAYAN

Defendants

DOC POPCORN & DIPPIN DOTS

PLAZA WEST COVINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RICARDO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/2/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/2/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/8/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Hearing12/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yadira Payan Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yadira Payan Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yadira Payan Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAZA WEST COVINA INC is a litigant