Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 19:14:31 (UTC).

YADIRA A TORRES VS MICAH SIERRA WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 YADIRA A TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICAH SIERRA WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4982

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TORRES YADIRA A.

Defendants and Respondents

WILLIAMS KATT

DOES 1 TO 20

WILLIAMS MICAH SIERRA

WILLIAMS MICAH SIERRA AKA KATT WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

UZOH AZUKA L. ESQ.

UZOH AZUKA LOUIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

Minute Order

5/9/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

7/11/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

7/17/2018: ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

Proof of Publication

9/25/2018: Proof of Publication

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

12/4/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/10/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/25/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

5/1/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/10/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/5/2017: Minute Order

SUMMONS

3/22/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/6/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/11/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/20/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice of Rejection Application and Order for Publication for Micah Sierra Williams; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to obtain default) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to obtain defau...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Application for Order to Publish; Filed by Yadira A. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to obtain default) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to obtain defau...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Yadira A. Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR 1. ASSAULT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC654982    Hearing Date: October 15, 2020    Dept: 74

BC654982 YADIRA A TORRES vs MICAH SIERRA WILLIAMS

OSC re Entry of Default Judgment

TENTATIVE RULING: The OSC is CONTINUED to November 19, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. for a default prove up hearing. Plaintiff should be prepared to present evidence supporting her claims for lost earnings, other economic damages, pain and suffering/emotional distress damages, and punitive damages.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer UZOH AZUKA LOUIS