This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 07:47:00 (UTC).

YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP VS MARC J GEDEON ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 YACOUBIAN POWELL LLP filed an Other lawsuit against MARC J GEDEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6329

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 5

GEDEON MARC J.

INFONEURO GROUP

MARC J. GEDEON A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

INFONEURO GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

POWELL STEWART J.

POWELL STEWART BAKER

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

AGOPOGLU BERC. ESQ.

MARC J. GEDEON. A PROF. LAW CORP.

AGOPOGLU BERC

HASIC HALIL

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF HAUL HASIC IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/5/2018: DECLARATION OF HAUL HASIC IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/5/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT MARC J. GEDEON, APLC'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, RELATED DEADLINES AND DEFENDANT'S PENDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.

9/10/2018: DEFENDANT MARC J. GEDEON, APLC'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, RELATED DEADLINES AND DEFENDANT'S PENDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.

DECLARATION OF BERC AGOPOGLU, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MARK J. GEDEON APLC'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

9/10/2018: DECLARATION OF BERC AGOPOGLU, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MARK J. GEDEON APLC'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY

9/10/2018: PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY

Notice

3/4/2019: Notice

Opposition

3/22/2019: Opposition

Request for Judicial Notice

3/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition

3/25/2019: Opposition

Objection

3/25/2019: Objection

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/4/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

4/9/2019: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISCHARGE OF PLAINTIFF YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP

10/17/2017: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISCHARGE OF PLAINTIFF YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP

Unknown

6/23/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

6/23/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

6/23/2017: COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

Unknown

8/1/2017: Unknown

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:46 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Reply (Response to Objection to Evidence); Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, a California Professional Law Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, a California Professional Law Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, a California Professional Law Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Reply (In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, a California Professional Law Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Supplemental Declaration (In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, a California Professional Law Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Opposition (to Defendant Marc J. Gedeon, a Professional Law Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities); Filed by Infoneuro Group, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Infoneuro Group, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Objection (to Evidence Submitted by Defendant Marc J. Gedeon in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Infoneuro Group, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Yacoubian & Powell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Yacoubian & Powell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Yacoubian & Powell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where INFONEURO GROUP A MEDICAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POWELL STEWART J.