This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 12:11:20 (UTC).

YAAKOV LEVY VS SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 YAAKOV LEVY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2620

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVY YAAKOV

Defendants

ADJUSTER DOE

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMAN GENE

Defendant Attorney

PORTER CORBAN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/17/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

7/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

9/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER

11/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 10/29/2021

10/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 10/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICAS NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

10/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICAS NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/31/2022

1/31/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/31/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

1/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of Removal to Federal Court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal to Federal Court) of 01/31/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ORDER); Filed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Removal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Removal) of 10/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Americas Notice Of Filing of Notice of Removal); Filed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yaakov Levy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Yaakov Levy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yaakov Levy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Yaakov Levy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yaakov Levy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Yaakov Levy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yaakov Levy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant