Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 08:39:02 (UTC).

YA-YA HOLDINGS, LLC VS MATTIOLI AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 YA-YA HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MATTIOLI AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0182

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YA-YA HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

MATTIOLI AUTOMOTIVE GROUP

FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PARIKH SAGAR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ya-Ya Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ya-Ya Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ya-Ya Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ya-Ya Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ferrari North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where YA-YA HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIKH SAGAR