This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 19:03:18 (UTC).

XUAN VAN LAM, ET AL. VS RAFAEL GARZA

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 XUAN VAN LAM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAFAEL GARZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3710

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LAM XUAN VAN

NGUYEN CHAC THI

LAM TONY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GARZA RAFAEL

GARZA MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNHAM DONALD TILDON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ESQUEDA EDWARD A.

FREED LEESA

Cross Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON III EDOR G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/2/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/15/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

9/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service

9/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/13/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/13/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

1/25/2021: Answer

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/21/2020: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Request for Dismissal

12/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rafael Garza (Cross-Complainant); Maria Garza (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Xuan Van Lam (Plaintiff); Chac Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Xuan Van Lam (Cross-Defendant); Tony Lam (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Rafael Garza (Cross-Complainant); Maria Garza (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rafael Garza (Cross-Complainant); Maria Garza (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rafael Garza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rafael Garza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Maria Garza (Cross-Complainant); Rafael Garza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Proof of Service); Filed by Xuan Van Lam (Plaintiff); Chac Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Xuan Van Lam (Plaintiff); Chac Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Xuan Van Lam (Plaintiff); Chac Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Xuan Van Lam (Plaintiff); Chac Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Xuan Van Lam (Plaintiff); Chac Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESQUEDA EDWARD A.