This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 04:24:30 (UTC).

XUAN DU VS ELEENA TAKAYAMA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 XUAN DU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELEENA TAKAYAMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7651

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DU XUAN

Defendants

TAKAYAMA DUKE TOMOHIKO

TAKAYAMA ELEENA

WOO BONNIE BONGTING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL RAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

3/4/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2024
  • Hearing10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bonnie Bongting Woo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Xuan Du (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Xuan Du (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Xuan Du (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Xuan Du (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL RAY