This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2020 at 01:51:59 (UTC).

XIN SU VS BIGBEAR TRUCKING CORP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 XIN SU filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BIGBEAR TRUCKING CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6141

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SU XIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES

Defendants

BIGBEAR TRUCKING CORP. A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS

HUANG QIANG AN INDIVIDUAL

ZHU HONGXING AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEN KELLY

Defendant Attorney

XU HANZHANG

 

Court Documents

Request - REQUEST STIPULATION FOR ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF REPRESENTATIVE ACTION CLAIMS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/18/2020: Request - REQUEST STIPULATION FOR ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF REPRESENTATIVE ACTION CLAIMS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Answer

4/2/2020: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/21/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

3/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/20/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/26/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF REPRESENTATIVE ACTION CLAIMS); Filed by Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bigbear Trucking Corp., a California business (Defendant); Qiang Huang, an individual (Defendant); Hongxing Zhu, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff); Bigbear Trucking Corp., a California business (Defendant); Qiang Huang, an individual (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff); Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Xin Su, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEN KELLY