Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 05:22:15 (UTC).

XIAO JUN DAI VS PACIFICLAND INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 XIAO JUN DAI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFICLAND INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2311

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAL XIAO JUN

DAI XIAO JUN

Defendants

PID-5 LP AKA IMPERIAL REGIONAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FIVE

PACIFICLAND INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT INC.

LO YU CHING AKA YU-CHING

LAW OFFICE OF HECTOR HU INC.

LO CHUN NAN AKA CHUN-NAN AKA JAMES LO

HU HAITAING

LO JAMES

HU HECTOR AKA HAITAING HU

HU HAITAING AKA HECTOR HU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY BARRY A.

ROSS JONATHAN A.

Defendant Attorneys

BRODSKY BARRY Z.

GEORGE ROSELY

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

1/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Case Management Statement

1/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/23/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/23/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/23/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/23/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS HECTOR HU AND LAW OFFICE OF HECTOR HU REPLY TO PLAINTIFF XIAO JUN DAI OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

9/30/2020: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS HECTOR HU AND LAW OFFICE OF HECTOR HU REPLY TO PLAINTIFF XIAO JUN DAI OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/2/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVE R. BELILOVE

8/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVE R. BELILOVE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW CAUSES OF ACTION AND STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/24/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW CAUSES OF ACTION AND STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/8/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/8/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling); Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Xiao Jun Dai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFICLAND INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS JONATHAN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY BARRY ALAN