This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 12:47:12 (UTC).

XIAO HUA WAN VS BIN ZHANG ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 XIAO HUA WAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIN ZHANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. BORENSTEIN, LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3633

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WAN XIAO HUA

Defendants and Respondents

DE OZARK GROUP INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

ZHANG BIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BAYLEY GUY R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

11/27/2018: Unknown

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/3/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/22/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/7/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

3/13/2017: Unknown

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

3/28/2017: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS

4/14/2017: SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

9/1/2017: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

9/1/2017: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (reRequest for Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Request for Entry of Default Judg...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Proof of Service - No Service (Of Summons); Filed by Xiao Hua Wan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Service - No Service (Of Summons); Filed by Xiao Hua Wan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Xiao Hua Wan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Xiao Hua Wan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 44; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Xiao Hua Wan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Xiao Hua Wan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC653633    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

On March 7, 2017, plaintiff Xiao Hua Wan (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants Bin Zhang and De Ozark Group, Inc. for injuries arising from a workplace altercation. The defendants were served on November 27, 2018 and December 3, 2018. The Court rejected Plaintiff’s default package on May 1, 2019 and set an OSC re dismissal for July 29, 2019. Plaintiff failed to appear, and the Court dismissed the case. Plaintiff now moves to vacate the dismissal entered on July 29, 2019.

“The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b).) Application for this relief shall be made within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken. (Ibid.) “[T]he court shall, whenever an application for relief is made no more than six months after entry of judgment, is in proper form, and is accompanied by an attorney’s sworn affidavit attesting to his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect, vacate any (1) resulting default entered by the clerk against his or her client, and which will result in entry of a default judgment, or (2) resulting default judgment or dismissal entered against his or her client, unless the court finds that the default or dismissal was not in fact caused by the attorney’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect.” (Ibid.)

Plaintiff’s counsel states he made a calendaring error causing him to now appear at the July 29, 2019 OSC hearing. Plaintiff timely filed this Motion within six months of dismissal, and the Court finds dismissal was due to counsel’s excusable neglect. The Motion to set aside the July 29, 2019 dismissal is GRANTED and the action is reinstated. The Court sets an OSC Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment for January 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.