This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2020 at 10:34:22 (UTC).

XIAO FENG LU VS MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 XIAO FENG LU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5746

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LU XIAO FENG

Defendant

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NONG JULIE

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/5/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/19/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Hearing06/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marriott International, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Xiao Feng Lu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Xiao Feng Lu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Xiao Feng Lu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Xiao Feng Lu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NONG JULIE