This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 08:08:53 (UTC).

XAVIERA LOPEZ VS CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 XAVIERA LOPEZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8774

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ XAVIERA

Cross Defendants and Defendants

CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY

CITY OF COMMERCE A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CITY OF COMMERCE A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW L.

Defendant Attorneys

DIEFFENBACH RICHARD P.

OSTERBERG KEVIN

BARBER JOHN

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

12/12/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/29/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/29/2022: Answer

Answer

5/3/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/10/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2025
  • Hearing03/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • Hearing08/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Cross-Defendant); As to: CITY OF COMMERCE, a government entity (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant); As to: Xaviera Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITY OF COMMERCE, a government entity (Defendant); As to: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF COMMERCE, a government entity (Defendant); As to: Xaviera Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: CITY OF COMMERCE, a government entity (Defendant); As to: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Xaviera Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 03/21/2022; Service Cost: 109.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Xaviera Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant); CITY OF COMMERCE, a government entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Xaviera Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant); CITY OF COMMERCE, a government entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Xaviera Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY (Defendant); CITY OF COMMERCE, a government entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF COMMERCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW L. ESQ.