This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 02:02:06 (UTC).

WYNDEN STARK LLC, VS JOHN DOE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 03/28/2023 WYNDEN STARK LLC, filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against JOHN DOE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6805

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WYNDEN STARK LLC DBA GQR GLOBAL MARKETS A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

DOE AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAN CAMILLA Y.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/28/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/28/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/28/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/28/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/28/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/28/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/29/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

7/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

7/21/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Camilla Y. Chan (Attorney): Organization Name changed from RAINES FELDMAN LLP to Raines Feldman Littrell, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketAddress for Camilla Y. Chan (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS; Filed by: WYNDEN STARK LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: WYNDEN STARK LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: WYNDEN STARK LLC, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 48 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAddress for Camilla Y. Chan (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WYNDEN STARK LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: John Doe, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WYNDEN STARK LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: John Doe, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WYNDEN STARK LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: John Doe, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less