Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 10:12:29 (UTC).

WYLIE CHUNG VS G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 WYLIE CHUNG filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against G E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8780

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHUNG WYLIE

Defendant

G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERTSON SARAH

MACMILLAN JOANNE ELIZABETH

Other Attorneys

TSARUKYAN ANDRANIK

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2021

4/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

12/7/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT AND PLAINTIFF WYLIE CHUNG OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

12/7/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT AND PLAINTIFF WYLIE CHUNG OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Answer

11/13/2020: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/14/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

10/8/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 2:07 PM in Department 39; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by G&E Real Estate Management Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by G&E Real Estate Management Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT AND PLAINTIFF WYLIE CHUNG OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT); Filed by G&E Real Estate Management Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by G&E Real Estate Management Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wylie Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wylie Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wylie Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wylie Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TSARUKYAN ANDRANIK