Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2020 at 20:24:09 (UTC).

WU, JIAYING VS LU, ZHENZONG

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 WU, JIAYING filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LU, ZHENZONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, H. DON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1107

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, H. DON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WU JIAYING

Respondent

LU ZHENZONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREEN JAMES BRADLEY

Respondent Attorney

SHI YI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice - Continuance (No Fee); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketReply (-Declaration of Zhenzong Lu in Opposition to Jiaying Wu's Response ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Completion; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketResponsive Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN JAMES B