This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 14:40:52 (UTC).

WRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA, WEST, INC. VS GO2 DIGITAL MEDIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 WRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA, WEST, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against GO2 DIGITAL MEDIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. FRUIN, MALCOLM MACKEY and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1499

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

MALCOLM MACKEY

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA WEST INC.

Respondents

GO2 Z 3 LLC

GO2 Z 4 LLC

GO2 Z 5 LLC

GRAHAM STEVE

GO2 DIGITAL MEDIA

THE GLOBAL ASYLUM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SCHLESINGER ALISA

SEGALL ANTHONY ROBERT

Respondent Attorney

MEEHAN SCOTT A.

 

Court Documents

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

5/10/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/07/2021

6/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Related Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Related Case

Response to Petition - RESPONSE TO PETITION RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIITES; DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. MEEHAN

6/1/2021: Response to Petition - RESPONSE TO PETITION RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIITES; DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. MEEHAN

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/18/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/11/2021

6/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/11/2021

Notice of Status Conference and Order

6/11/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/11/2021

6/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/11/2021

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/4/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/3/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Association of Attorney

7/15/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/10/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RELATED TO 18STCV09984))

4/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RELATED TO 18STCV09984))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Status Conference ((Related to 18STCV09984)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Related to 18STCV09984))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Status Conference ((Related to 18STCV09984)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docketat 11:04 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Continuance of Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Status Conference ((Related to 18STCV09984)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Status Conference ((Related to 18STCV09984)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Status Conference ((Related to 18STCV09984)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 06/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 2:47 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Go2 Digital Media (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Go2 Digital Media (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Go2 Digital Media (Respondent); Go2 Z 3, LLC (Respondent); Go2 Z 4, LLC (Respondent) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketResponse and Opposition to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Scott A. Meehan; Filed by Go2 Digital Media (Respondent); Go2 Z 3, LLC (Respondent); Go2 Z 4, LLC (Respondent) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GO2 DIGITAL MEDIA is a litigant