This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 06:25:34 (UTC).

WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP. VS PRINCESS ANN JONES

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRINCESS ANN JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

JONES PRINCESS ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGUIRE RICHARD E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/3/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/3/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/3/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/3/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

2/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/28/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

2/28/2023: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

2/28/2023: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: World Omni Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Princess Ann Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration in Support of Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: World Omni Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: World Omni Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: World Omni Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: World Omni Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Princess Ann Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: World Omni Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Princess Ann Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: World Omni Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Princess Ann Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 36 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less