This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 01:20:38 (UTC).

WORLD MECHANICAL, INC. VS SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 WORLD MECHANICAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4158

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD MECHANICAL INC.

Defendants

813 SOUTH FLOWER STREET ASSOCIATES LLC

PACIFICA HOTELS/WAYFARER DOWNTOWN LA

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALRYMPLE BRENDON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by World Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by World Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by World Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by World Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by World Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD MECHANICAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where 813 SOUTH FLOWER STREET ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. is a litigant