This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2021 at 21:57:37 (UTC).

WORLD MECHANICAL INC VS DREAM SELMA RESTAURANT LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 WORLD MECHANICAL INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DREAM SELMA RESTAURANT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4952

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WORLD MECHANICAL INC

Defendants and Respondents

DREAM SELMA RESTAURANT LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

FIVE CHAIRS CONSTRUSTION LLC

HOLLYWOOD INTERNATIONAL REGIONAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CREDE KENNETH J.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/8/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

11/8/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

9/22/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/22/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

9/6/2017: SUMMONS

WORLD MECHANICAL'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

9/6/2017: WORLD MECHANICAL'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WORLD MECHANICAL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketWORLD MECHANICAL'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIVE CHAIRS CONSTRUSTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD INTERNATIONAL REGIONAL CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD MECHANICAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CREDE KENNETH