This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2021 at 19:47:21 (UTC).

WORLD MECHANICAL INC. VS DHC BUILDERS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 WORLD MECHANICAL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DHC BUILDERS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK H. EPSTEIN and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1722

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK H. EPSTEIN

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD MECHANICAL INC.

Defendants

DHC BUILDERS INC.

8600 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD LLC

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CREDE KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION

12/31/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2021

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2021

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/29/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/29/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Related Case

12/2/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

12/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/17/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION & STAY ACTION

12/17/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION & STAY ACTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLENN E. TURNER, III, IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLENN E. TURNER, III, IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. WAGNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - PART 2

12/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. WAGNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - PART 2

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. WAGNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - PART 1

12/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. WAGNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - PART 1

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/2/2020: Motion to Compel Arbitration

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:08 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration In Support Of Motion); Filed by DHC Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration In Support Of Motion); Filed by DHC Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DHC Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by DHC Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by World Mechanical Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by World Mechanical Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by World Mechanical Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by World Mechanical Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD MECHANICAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DHC BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where 8600 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant