Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2021 at 10:07:33 (UTC).

WORLD DOG ALLIANCE VS HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.,

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 WORLD DOG ALLIANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0635

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD DOG ALLIANCE

Defendants

HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.

HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. DBA WALDORF ASTORIA BEVERLY HILLS

HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA WALDORF ASTORIA BEVERLY HILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEANG EVIE PEI

Defendant Attorney

KHODADADI PAYAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL;)

8/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL;)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL DATED 8-31-20

8/31/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL DATED 8-31-20

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; HEARING ON MOT...)

8/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; HEARING ON MOT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; HEARING ON MOT...) OF 08/25/2020

8/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; HEARING ON MOT...) OF 08/25/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF (1) MOTION FOR ORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND (2) MOTION FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

4/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF (1) MOTION FOR ORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND (2) MOTION FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COURT CLOSURES;) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COURT CLOSURES;) OF 03/18/2020

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

1/15/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

Notice of Ruling

1/17/2020: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/31/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Service by Mail

12/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVIE P. JEANG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF IDEAL LEGAL GROUP TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

12/31/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVIE P. JEANG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF IDEAL LEGAL GROUP TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/31/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/23/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Complaint

4/3/2019: Complaint

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Filing of Judgment of Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docketat 3:21 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Entry of Judgment of Dismissal;) of 08/31/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Entry of Judgment of Dismissal;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal Dated 8-31-20); Filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Minute Order Dated 8-25-20); Filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketJudgment (re Dismissal); Filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by World Dog Alliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by World Dog Alliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by World Dog Alliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by World Dog Alliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by World Dog Alliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by World Dog Alliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD DOG ALLIANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHODADADI PAYAM