This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 12:40:44 (UTC).

WORKFORCE ENTERPRISES WFE, INC VS WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 WORKFORCE ENTERPRISES WFE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0099

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORKFORCE ENTERPRISES WFE INC

Defendant

WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYER JASON JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

BENDER RON

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY CODE

9/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY CODE

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/30/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

7/31/2019: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

6/26/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/9/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

5/9/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Default Judgment

5/13/2019: Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of Attachment

3/27/2019: Writ of Attachment

Notice of Ruling

3/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

3/11/2019: Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/8/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))

3/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))

Proof of Service by Mail

2/28/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/21/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Filing of Petition for Relief Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code); Filed by West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 05/13/2019 entered for Plaintiff Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc., a California corporation against Defendant West Coast Distribution, Inc., a California corporation.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketApplication and Notice of Application and Hearing for Order to Quash Ex Parte Writ of Possession; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Maritza Avila in Support of Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment); Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketBreach of Contract; Common Count; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Workforce Enterprises WFE, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less