This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:56:31 (UTC).

WOODS, MATTIE B. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 WOODS, MATTIE B - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R., LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A. and STRATTON, MARIA E.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2311

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WOODS BARBARA

Decedent

WOODS MATTIE B.

Not Classified By Court

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MATHRANI LAVENA

 

Court Documents

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/2/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Bond

6/16/2017: Bond

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

2/8/2018: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Minute Order

10/5/2018: Minute Order

Order - Waiver, Final Distribution,

8/6/2018: Order - Waiver, Final Distribution,

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

10/9/2018: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Minute Order

8/2/2018: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

7/2/2018: Notice - Hearing

Proof of Publication

4/3/2017: Proof of Publication

Account - Final or Waiver - Waiver of Account, Final Distribution, Fees

5/24/2018: Account - Final or Waiver - Waiver of Account, Final Distribution, Fees

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

3/16/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3/20/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Letters (Initial)

8/9/2017: Letters (Initial)

Minute Order

5/23/2017: Minute Order

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - Will - 6 pages

3/16/2017: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - Will - 6 pages

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

3/16/2017: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

4/27/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

Will - Admitted

5/23/2017: Will - Admitted

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • in Probate Department 5, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Order (Waiver, Final Distribution, ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • in Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Account - Final or Waiver (Waiver of Account, Final Distribution, Fees ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Will (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Supplement (To Form DE-111, Paragraph 5 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) (Will - 6 pages ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less