This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2022 at 03:01:15 (UTC).

WOODLAND OAKS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. VS SUSIE ABELSHAHED

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 WOODLAND OAKS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUSIE ABELSHAHED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1660

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODLAND OAKS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC.

Defendant

ABELSHAHED SUSIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBS KAREN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

12/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Woodland Oaks Condominium Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Woodland Oaks Condominium Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Woodland Oaks Condominium Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Woodland Oaks Condominium Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Woodland Oaks Condominium Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Woodland Oaks Condominium Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODLAND OAKS CONDOMINIUM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS KAREN