This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2021 at 03:40:01 (UTC).

WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS OCEANWIDE PLAZA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against OCEANWIDE PLAZA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6046

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

WOODBRIDGE GLASS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ANNING-JOHNSON COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ADVANCED CABLE SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FETZER'S INC. A UTAH CORPORATION

CHUTE SYSTEMS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AMERICAN STAIR CORPORATION AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

BAPKO METAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EMSER TILE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

TWINING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WOODBRIDGE GLASS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZOLNAY INSULATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STANDARD DRYWALL INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

XL FIRE PROTECTION CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JOHNSON CONTROLS LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MASONRY CONCEPTS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STRUCTURAL SHOTCRETE SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LA DOWNTOWN INVESTMENT LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PAN-PACIFIC MECHNICAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KAMRAN AND COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CMF INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BUTLER KEITH EDWARD

ELIOPOULOS WILLIAM THEODORE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/2/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 03/19/2021

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 03/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

3/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

Request for Dismissal

1/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/24/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Lifting on Stay of Discovery) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Related Cases) of 03/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Woodbridge Glass, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Woodbridge Glass, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Woodbridge Glass, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Woodbridge Glass, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Woodbridge Glass, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Woodbridge Glass, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMSER TILE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STRUCTURAL SHOTCRETE SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHUTE SYSTEMS LLC is a litigant