This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 23:10:59 (UTC).

WOL SOON SHIM VS ALEXANDRA EVELYN VILLALOBOS

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 WOL SOON SHIM filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDRA EVELYN VILLALOBOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6176

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIM WOL SOON

Defendant

VILLALOBOS ALEXANDRA EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN RICHARD D

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/13/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/31/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Hearing05/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Wol Soon Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wol Soon Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wol Soon Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wol Soon Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN RICHARD D.