This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 18:41:01 (UTC).

WINSTON NESMITH VS RENATO APARTMENTS, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 WINSTON NESMITH filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RENATO APARTMENTS, LP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8941

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NESMITH WINSTON

Defendants

NELSON ANITA U.

RENATO APARTMENTS LP

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

RENATO APARTMENTS LP

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELTZER IRA

Defendant Attorney

LEE TED M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/14/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/14/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/14/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/14/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

8/29/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/29/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/29/2022: Cross-Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2025
  • Hearing03/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • Hearing09/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Renato Apartments, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Renato Apartments, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Renato Apartments, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Renato Apartments, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Renato Apartments, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Winston Nesmith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Winston Nesmith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Winston Nesmith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Winston Nesmith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Winston Nesmith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less