This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 21:33:23 (UTC).

WINGS CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, ET AL. VS CHUBB EUROPEAN GROUP SE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2023 WINGS CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CHUBB EUROPEAN GROUP SE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAWRENCE P. RIFF and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4790

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Defendants

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP UK LIMITED

AXIS SPECIALTY EUROPE SE

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE LTD.

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 0435

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 0510

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 0623

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 1084

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 1183

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 1301

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 1856

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 1880

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 1919

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 1969

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 2623

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S SYNDICATE 4472

CHUBB EUROPEAN GROUP SE

CONVEX INSURANCE UK LIMITED

FIDELIS INSURANCE IRELAND DESIGNATED ACTIVITY COMPANY

FIDELIS UNDERWRITING LIMITED

GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HALBREICH DAVID M.

HARRIS CODY SHAWN

LITTLE JAN NIELSEN

MINASIAN NOORVIK

MOROF JEFFREY

MULLEN WILLIAM COLIN

O'CONNOR JOSEPH R.

POPHAM MITCHELL J.

TAYLOR ANN

BUZZARD ERIK D.

GOETZ RICHARD BLAIR

KIBLER MICHAEL DAVID

MORGAN AMANDA LYNN

BORJIGIN SHIQI WANG

Other Attorneys

COLETTA-SWIDLER KYA ROSE

ELLENA KATHERINE JANE

FINCH AMBER SUMMER

WEISS DAVID EVAN

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

4/27/2023: Notice of Appearance

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS FOR DOUGLAS D. L. BAKER AND RUSSELL M. SQUIRE

9/12/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS FOR DOUGLAS D. L. BAKER AND RUSSELL M. SQUIRE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF WITHDRAWAL OF KAREN SCHNUR AND APPEARANCE OF KRISTINA ROGAN AND PAUL DEHMEL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANTS AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP UK LIMITED A

9/12/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF WITHDRAWAL OF KAREN SCHNUR AND APPEARANCE OF KRISTINA ROGAN AND PAUL DEHMEL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANTS AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP UK LIMITED A

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - PAUL R. DEHMEL'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

9/12/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - PAUL R. DEHMEL'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/6/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RUSSELL M. SQUIRE TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/31/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RUSSELL M. SQUIRE TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF AIDAN M. MCCORMACK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/31/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF AIDAN M. MCCORMACK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF JOSEPH D. DAVISON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/31/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF JOSEPH D. DAVISON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DOUGLAS D.L. BAKER TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/31/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DOUGLAS D.L. BAKER TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

8/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

8/21/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND HARD COPY DOCUMENTS

8/17/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND HARD COPY DOCUMENTS

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - DOUGLAS D.L. BAKER'S APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/16/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - DOUGLAS D.L. BAKER'S APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR RUSSELL M. SQUIRE TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/15/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR RUSSELL M. SQUIRE TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JOSEPH D. DAVISON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

8/14/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JOSEPH D. DAVISON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION OF AIDAN M. MCCORMACK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

8/14/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION OF AIDAN M. MCCORMACK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DURING STATUS CONFERENCE

7/21/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DURING STATUS CONFERENCE

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2024
  • Hearing09/04/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2024
  • Hearing07/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2024
  • Hearing05/09/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2024
  • Hearing05/03/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2024
  • Hearing05/03/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2023
  • Hearing10/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketNotice Of Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Applications For Douglas D. L. Baker And Russell M. Squire; Filed by: Wings Capital Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Halbreich (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Karen Schnur and Appearance of Kristina Rogan and Paul Dehmel as Counsel of Record for Defendants American International Group UK Limited and Lloyds Syndicate 1183 Subscribing to Policy Number B080125525A211; Filed by: Lloyds Syndicate 1183 Subscribing to Policy Number B080125525a21 (Defendant); American International Group UK Limited (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketPaul R. Dehmel's Notice of Application and Verified Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Lloyds Syndicate 1183 Subscribing to Policy Number B080125525a21 (Defendant); American International Group UK Limited (Defendant); As to: Lloyds Syndicate 1183 Subscribing to Policy Number B080125525a21 (Defendant); American International Group UK Limited (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service of Summons; Filed by: Wings Capital Partners LLC (Plaintiff); Wings Aviation 5779 Limited (Plaintiff); As to: Certain Underwriters Of Lloyd's Syndicate 2623 (Defendant); Service Cost: 42.27; Service Date: 03/07/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service of Summons; Filed by: Wings Capital Partners LLC (Plaintiff); Wings Aviation 5779 Limited (Plaintiff); As to: Chubb European Group SE (Defendant); Service Cost: 157.65; Service Date: 03/07/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wings Capital Partners LLC (Plaintiff); Wings Aviation 5779 Limited (Plaintiff); As to: Chubb European Group SE (Defendant); American International Group UK Limited (Defendant); Axis Specialty Europe SE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wings Capital Partners LLC (Plaintiff); Wings Aviation 5779 Limited (Plaintiff); As to: Chubb European Group SE (Defendant); American International Group UK Limited (Defendant); Axis Specialty Europe SE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wings Capital Partners LLC (Plaintiff); Wings Aviation 5779 Limited (Plaintiff); As to: Chubb European Group SE (Defendant); American International Group UK Limited (Defendant); Axis Specialty Europe SE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less