This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2020 at 04:20:21 (UTC).

WINDOM, IMANI LEE VS JONES, SUMMER

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 WINDOM, IMANI LEE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against JONES, SUMMER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DURON, ARMANDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0253

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DURON, ARMANDO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WINDOM IMANI LEE

Respondent

JONES SUMMER

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/13/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/13/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Fee Waiver - Court Order Fee Waiver - Hearing Set FW003

2/13/2020: Fee Waiver - Court Order Fee Waiver - Hearing Set FW003

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/13/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

Petition - Civil Harassment

2/13/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Proof of Service

2/21/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

3/5/2020: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (ADDENDUM )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Court Order Fee Waiver - Hearing Set FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.