This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:44:52 (UTC).

WILSHIRE RG NOTE GROUP LLC ET AL VS D & Z INVESTMENTS LLC ET

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 WILSHIRE RG NOTE GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against D Z INVESTMENTS LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3710

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WILSHIRE RG NOTE GROUP LLC

GOLBARI RAY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

D & Z INVESTMENTS LLC

ZARABI DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TORABI KASRA S.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RICHARDS RONALD N. ESQ.

LONG GEOFFREY S.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF RONALD RICHARDS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 (A)(2)

5/23/2018: DECLARATION OF RONALD RICHARDS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 (A)(2)

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTIIORITWS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY LONG

7/24/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTIIORITWS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY LONG

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

7/24/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

7/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

MEMO OF COSTS

8/9/2018: MEMO OF COSTS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/2/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Related Cases

4/23/2018: Notice of Related Cases

COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY

4/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY

SUMMONS

4/23/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • MEMO OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by D & Z Investments, LLC (Defendant); Daniel Zarabi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Wilshire RG Note Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by D & Z Investments, LLC (Defendant); Daniel Zarabi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Demurrer; Filed by D & Z Investments, LLC (Defendant); Daniel Zarabi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTIIORITWS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by D & Z Investments, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Wilshire RG Note Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Wilshire RG Note Group, LLC (Plaintiff); Ray Golbari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORABI KASRA SEYED